Lankford v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05167
Filed: September 8, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2007 21 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 17 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Michelle A. Lankford, and 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees for Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Michelle A. Lankford in amount of $2,948.08. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 6/15/07. (ct)
June 11, 2007 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re 17 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Michelle A. Lankford. (Brooks, Evelyn)
June 8, 2007 19 RESPONSE to Motion re 17 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
May 25, 2007 18 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of EAJA Attorney Fees and Costs by Michelle A. Lankford. (Brooks, Evelyn)
May 25, 2007 17 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Michelle A. Lankford. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1) Memorandum and Order# 2 Exhibit A(2) Judgement# 3 Exhibit B Timesheet# 4 Exhibit C Consumer Price Index)(Brooks, Evelyn)
May 21, 2007 16 Featured Case ORDER re 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees for Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Michelle A. Lankford, directing plaintiff to amend the motion for attorney fees by 5/29/07 . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/21/07. (ct)
May 18, 2007 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees for Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
May 4, 2007 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees for Equal Access to Justice Act by Michelle A. Lankford. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A EAJA Brief# 2 Exhibit Ex. B EAJA Timesheet# 3 Exhibit Ex. C CPI)(Brooks, Evelyn)
February 7, 2007 13 JUDGMENT REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY and dismissing case. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 2/7/07. (ct)
February 7, 2007 12 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 2/7/07. (ct)
February 5, 2007 11 MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 16, 2007 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
December 14, 2006 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Michelle A. Lankford. (Brooks, Evelyn)
November 15, 2006 8 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 11/15/2006. (cla)
November 15, 2006 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (cla)
November 14, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/14/2006. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/15/2007. (rw)
November 14, 2006 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
November 6, 2006 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on November 6, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent; # 2 Government's Consent)(mfr)
September 8, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER granting application to proceed IFP and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of 9/6/06. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on September 7, 2006. (This is a re-filing of doc# 3 that had the wrong PDF attached.)(jn)
September 8, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
September 8, 2006 3 Featured Case ***DISREGARD ENTRY; WRONG PDF ATTACHED; RE-FILED*** ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Michelle A. Lankford. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on September 7, 2006. (tg) Modified on 9/11/2006 to show re-filing (jn).
September 8, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Michelle A. Lankford. (tg)
September 8, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Michelle A. Lankford to be filed nunc pro tunc as of September 6, 2006.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lankford v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?