Fullerton v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05174
Filed: September 21, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2007 16 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 15 , affirming decision of Administrative Law Judge and dismissing complaint w/prej. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on September 26, 2006. (ct)
September 7, 2007 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Jon Fullerton. Objections to R&R due by 9/24/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on September 7, 2007. (jn)
March 28, 2007 14 Featured Case ORDER finding as moot 12 Motion to Continue . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on March 28, 2007. (jn)
March 26, 2007 13 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Jon Fullerton. (Cazort, Mildred)
March 23, 2007 12 Second MOTION to Continue time for filing brief by Jon Fullerton. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 24, 2007 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion to Continue. Appellant Brief due by 3/23/2007.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 1/24/07. (ct)
January 24, 2007 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 22, 2007 9 First MOTION to Continue time for filing brief by Jon Fullerton. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Referred to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
December 11, 2006 8 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 12/11/2006. (cla)
December 11, 2006 7 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief.(cla)
December 8, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/8/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/6/2007. (mfr)
December 8, 2006 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
October 11, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
September 21, 2006 5 Featured Case ORDER re 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jon Fullerton, Motions terminated: 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jon Fullerton. Clerk directed to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 9/13/06.. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 9/18/06. (ct)
September 21, 2006 4 AFFIDAVIT of Jon Fullerton filed by Jon Fullerton re 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
September 21, 2006 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jon Fullerton. (ct)
September 21, 2006 2 SUPPLEMENT to Complaint by Plaintiff Jon Fullerton to 1 Complaint. (Exhibit to complaint that was inadvertently omitted) (ct)
September 21, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Jon Fullerton. Filed Nunc Pro Tunc as of 9/13/06(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fullerton v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?