Kimer v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05178
Filed: September 26, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2007 21 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of John A. Kimer against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 13, 2007. (tg)
December 4, 2007 20 ***DISREGARD DUPLICATE ENTRY*** REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by John A. Kimer. Objections to R&R due by 12/21/2007. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 30, 2007. (tg)
November 30, 2007 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by John A. Kimer. Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2007. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 30, 2007. (tg)
November 30, 2007 18 ***DISREGARD ENTRY WRONG EVENT USED*** MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 30, 2007. (tg) Modified on 12/3/2007 to add text(tg).
November 26, 2007 17 RESPONSE to Motion re 15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 15, 2007 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(tg)
November 14, 2007 16 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by John A. Kimer. (Cazort, Mildred)
November 14, 2007 15 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by John A. Kimer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B EAJA Bill, # 3 Exhibit C Consumer Price Index)(Cazort, Mildred)
September 6, 2007 14 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY and reversing the decision of the Commissioner pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on September 6, 2007. cc: ALJ & OHA(tg)
August 17, 2007 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by John A. Kimer, Objections to R&R due by 9/4/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on August 17, 2007. (ct)
April 23, 2007 12 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 19, 2007 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by John A. Kimer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Medical 1993# 2 Exhibit B Medical October 2005# 3 Exhibit C Medical November 2005)(Cazort, Mildred)
January 24, 2007 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion to Continue. Appellant Brief due by 3/23/2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on January 24, 2007. (tg)
January 22, 2007 9 First MOTION to Continue time for filing brief by John A. Kimer. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Referred to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
December 14, 2006 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Social Security Administration Commissioner to Social Security Transcript. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (mfr)
December 13, 2006 8 SUPPLEMENT by Defendant Social Security Administration Commissioner to Social Security Transcript,. (Hawkins, Claude)
December 11, 2006 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 12/11/2006. (cla)
December 11, 2006 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (cla)
December 8, 2006 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/8/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/6/2007. (mfr)
December 8, 2006 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
October 11, 2006 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
September 26, 2006 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. The Clerk is directed to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of September 20, 2006. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on September 22, 2006. (tg)
September 26, 2006 3 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John A. Kimer. (tg)
September 26, 2006 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John A. Kimer. (tg)
September 26, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by John A. Kimer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimer v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?