Kimbrell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Number: 5:2006cv05199
Filed: October 12, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 6, 2007 15 JUDGMENT affirming decision of the Commissioner and dismissing plaintiff's case with prejudice ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on September 6, 2007. (tg)
September 6, 2007 14 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on September 6, 2007. (tg)
February 22, 2007 13 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 23, 2007 12 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Russell R. Kimbrell. (Niblock, Raymond)
January 11, 2007 11 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Russell R. Kimbrell. Amendment to 8 Affidavit of Service as to USA, Amendment to show the correct party serving document. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Service Letter on United States Attorney# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Postal Service Return form 3811)(Niblock, Raymond)
January 11, 2007 10 NOTICE by Russell R. Kimbrell Letter attempting to perfect service on Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Copy of service letter sent to Commissioner of SSA# 2 Exhibit Copy of Summons sent with Notice of Attempt to Perfect Service)(Niblock, Raymond)
January 11, 2007 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service on United States Attorney General, filed by Russell R. Kimbrell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhbit A, Service Letter on USAG# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Postal Service Return Form 3811)(Niblock, Raymond)
January 11, 2007 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service on United States Attorney for Western District of Arkansas, filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 10/31/2006, answer due 12/30/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Service Letter on United States Attorney# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Returned Postal Service Form 3811)(Niblock, Raymond)
January 4, 2007 7 Order Limiting Social Security Appeal Briefs of the parties to a maximum of 20 pages. Any brief exceeding the page limitation may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 01/04/2007. (cla)
January 4, 2007 6 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING LETTER - Plaintiff's brief (if any) is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If Plaintiff does not file brief within 30 days, Commissioner has 30 days from date on which Plaintiff's brief would be due to submit brief. (cla)
January 4, 2007 MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case Reassigned to Judge James R. Marschewski. Judge Beverly Stites Jones no longer assigned to the case. (rls)
January 3, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/2/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/5/2007. (mfr)
January 3, 2007 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
November 9, 2006 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beverly Stites Jones. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on November 9, 2006. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent; # 2 Government's Consent)(mfr)
October 12, 2006 3 Featured Case ORDER directing that the 2 Application to proceed ifp, filed by Russell R. Kimbrell, be granted; and the 1 Complaint, filed by Russell R. Kimbrell, be filed in forma pauperis nunc pro tunc as of 10/6/06. Signed by Judge Beverly Stites Jones on 10/10/06. (ct)
October 12, 2006 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Russell R. Kimbrell. (ct)
October 12, 2006 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Russell R. Kimbrell. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 10/6/06(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimbrell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?