Bunch v. Craig et al

Case Number: 5:2006cv05220
Filed: November 17, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2009 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 71 Report and Recommendations, dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 1, 2009. (src)
March 30, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Henry J. Bunch. Objections to R&R due by 4/16/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 30, 2009. (tg)
September 18, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 31 Motion to Strike ; ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Honorable James R. Marschewski; Nathaniel R. Coy and Thomas E. Reed terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 18, 2008. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bunch v. Craig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?