Shaw v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Steven Shaw
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05022
Filed: February 6, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2008 19 Featured Case ORDER on Attorney Fees in favor of Steven Shaw against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on July 8, 2008. (ct)
June 17, 2008 18 RESPONSE to Motion re 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal to Access Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
June 3, 2008 17 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal to Justice Act by Steven Shaw. (Brooks, Evelyn)
June 3, 2008 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal to Access Justice Act by Steven Shaw. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1)-Memorandum Opinion, # 2 Exhibit A (2)-Judgment, # 3 Exhibit B-Timesheet, # 4 Exhibit C-Consumer Price Index)(Brooks, Evelyn)
June 3, 2008 15 ***DISREGARD ENTRY WRONG EVENT USED*** APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Steven Shaw. (Brooks, Evelyn) Modified on 6/3/2008 to add text(tg).
March 6, 2008 14 JUDGMENT REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g). Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 6, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct) Modified on 3/6/2008 to correct text(ct).
March 6, 2008 13 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 6, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
June 20, 2007 12 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
May 16, 2007 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and allows 2 additional pages. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 5/16/07. (ct)
May 16, 2007 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Steven Shaw. (Brooks, Evelyn)
May 14, 2007 9 MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Steven Shaw. (Brooks, Evelyn)
April 16, 2007 8 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff's SSA brief is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If plaintiff does not file a brief within the 30 days, the defendant will have 30 days from the date on which plaintiff's brief would be due in which to submit a brief. The brief should be no longer than 20 pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 04/16/2007. (caz)
April 16, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/16/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/15/2007. (mfr)
April 13, 2007 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Steven Shaw. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to Chief Counsel# 2 Exhibit B-Certified Mail Receipts)(Brooks, Evelyn)
April 13, 2007 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
April 12, 2007 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Steven Shaw. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 2/14/2007, answer due 3/6/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to Chief Counsel# 2 Exhibit B-Certified Mail Receipts)(Brooks, Evelyn)
February 21, 2007 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on February 21, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
February 8, 2007 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner and returned to attorney for service (ct)
February 6, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application filed by Steven Shaw to proceed ifp and 1 directing clerk to file the Complaint nun pro tunc as of 1/29/07. . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 2/1/07. (ct)
February 6, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Steven Shaw (ct)
February 6, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Steven Shaw. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 1/29/07(ct) Modified on 2/7/2007 to add nunc pro tunc text (jn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Shaw
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Claude S. Hawkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?