Reed v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Kathleen M Reed
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05025
Filed: February 13, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2008 16 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Kathleen M Reed against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 20, 2008. (tg)
February 12, 2008 15 RESPONSE to Motion re 13 Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 29, 2008 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Kathleen M Reed. (Brooks, Evelyn)
January 29, 2008 13 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Kathleen M Reed. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1) -Memorandum Opinion, # 2 Exhibit A (2)-Judgment, # 3 Exhibit B-Timesheet, # 4 Exhibit C-Consumer Price Index)(Brooks, Evelyn) Modified on 1/31/2008 to correct text (jn).
November 1, 2007 12 JUDGMENT REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g). Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on November 1, 2007. (cc: ALJ & OHA)(jn)
November 1, 2007 11 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on November 1, 2007. (cc: ALJ & OHA)(jn)
June 13, 2007 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Application to proceed IFP filed by Kathleen M Reed. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on June 11, 2007. (tg) Modified on 6/15/2007 to add text (tg).
June 12, 2007 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
May 18, 2007 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Kathleen M Reed. (Brooks, Evelyn)
April 20, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff's SSA brief is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If plaintiff does not file a brief within the 30 days, the defendant will have 30 days from the date on which plaintiff's brief would be due in which to submit a brief. The brief should be no longer than 20 pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 04/20/2007. (cla)
April 18, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 5/18/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 6/18/2007. (rw)
April 18, 2007 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
March 7, 2007 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service, filed by Kathleen M Reed. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 2/22/2007, answer due 4/23/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to Chief Counsel# 2 Exhibit B-Certified Mail Receipts)(Brooks, Evelyn)
February 26, 2007 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on February 26, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
February 20, 2007 4 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Kathleen M Reed. (tg)
February 13, 2007 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
February 13, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER provisionally filing complaint nunc pro tunc as of February 6, 2007, prior to determination as a pauper re 1 Complaint filed by Kathleen M Reed. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on February 9, 2007. (tg) Modified on 2/14/2007 to add text(tg).
February 13, 2007 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File IFP by Kathleen M Reed. (tg)
February 13, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Kathleen M Reed. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 2/6/07(tg) Modified on 2/14/2007 to add nunc pro tunc language (jn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Claude S. Hawkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen M Reed
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?