Widen et al v. Menu Foods et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Richard Scott Widen and Barbara Widen
Defendant: Menu Foods, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Gen Par Limited, Menu Foods Limited Partnership, Menu Foods Operating Partnership, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods South Dakota, Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2007cv05055
Filed: March 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2007 Filing 18
NOTICE of Appearance by Leisa B. Pearlman on behalf of Richard Scott Widen, Barbara Widen (Pearlman, Leisa)
June 28, 2007 Filing 17
Transmittal of Documents to U.S. District Court, District of NJ: Certified copy of docket sheet, MDL Transfer Order with letter as requested by clerk, District of NJ. (tg)
April 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14
ORDER granting 8 Motion to Stay pending transfer decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on 4/27/07. (ct)
April 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12
ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive pleading to May 15, 2007 . Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on 4/25/07. (ct)
April 17, 2007 Filing 9
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 8 MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, by Menu Foods Operating Partnership, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods South Dakota, Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Menu Foods, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Gen Par Limited, Menu Foods Limited Partnership. (Comstock, Christy)
April 13, 2007 Filing 7
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Chad Hutchinson on behalf of Richard Scott Widen, Barbara Widen (Hutchinson, Timothy)
April 5, 2007 Filing 6
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean F. Rommel on behalf of all plaintiffs (Rommel, Sean)
April 4, 2007 Filing 5
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard A. Adams on behalf of all plaintiffs (Adams, Richard)
March 23, 2007 Filing 1
COMPLAINT against Menu Foods Operating Partnership, Menu Foods Midwest Corporation, Menu Foods South Dakota, Menu Foods, Inc., Menu Foods Holdings, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Menu Foods, Menu Foods Income Fund, Menu Foods Gen Par Limited, Menu Foods Limited Partnership ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 5000051.), filed by Richard Scott Widen, Barbara Widen.(ct)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Widen et al v. Menu Foods et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Scott Widen
Represented By: James C. Wyly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Widen
Represented By: James C. Wyly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Income Fund
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Gen Par Limited
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Limited Partnership
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Operating Partnership
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Midwest Corporation
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods South Dakota
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Foods Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?