Steed v. Tomlan et al

Plaintiff: Phillip Alexander Steed
Defendant: Tomlan, Jail Nurse and Benton County Jail
Case Number: 5:2007cv05058
Filed: April 3, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dismissing case. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 26, 2009. (src)
October 2, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Phillip Alexander Steed. Objections to R&R due by 10/22/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 2, 2009. (tg)
March 5, 2009 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 23 Report and Recommendations; granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 5, 2009. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(tg) Modified on 3/6/2009 to edit document link (cnn).
February 12, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hunter Petray, Lorie Bird and Tomlan. Objections to R&R due by 3/2/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 12, 2009. (tg)
April 3, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Phillip Alexander Steed. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on March 28, 2007. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steed v. Tomlan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Alexander Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?