Todd v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Douglas Lee Todd
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05060
Filed: April 6, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2008 11 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and affirming the decision of the ALJ and dismissing plaintiff's complaint with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 12, 2008. (tg)
January 22, 2008 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 6 Complaint filed by Douglas Lee Todd Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 22, 2008. (tg)
August 2, 2007 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
July 23, 2007 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Douglas Lee Todd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A DOT Dispatcher# 2 Exhibit B DOT Cashier II# 3 Exhibit C DOT)(Cazort, Mildred)
July 3, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff's SSA brief is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If plaintiff does not file a brief within the 30 days, the defendant will have 30 days from the date on which plaintiff's brief would be due in which to submit a brief. The brief should be no longer than 20 pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 07/03/2007. (caz)
June 27, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 7/27/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/27/2007. (mfr)
June 27, 2007 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
April 30, 2007 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
April 6, 2007 6 ***RE-DOCKETED TO CORRECT PDF***COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Douglas Lee Todd.(tg)
April 6, 2007 5 ***DISREGARD - RE-DOCKETED TO CORRECT PDF***COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Douglas Lee Todd. (tg) Modified on 4/9/2007 to correct PDF (tg).
April 6, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Clerk is directed to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of April 2, 2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on April 4, 2007. (tg)
April 6, 2007 3 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Douglas Lee Todd. (tg)
April 6, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Douglas Lee Todd. (tg)
April 6, 2007 1 ***DISREGARD - REDOCKETED TO CORRECT PDF***COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed by Douglas Lee Todd.(tg) Modified on 4/9/2007 (tg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Lee Todd
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Claude S. Hawkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?