Enos v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Mitch Enos
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05062
Filed: April 6, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2008 15 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. in favor of Mitch Enos against Social Security Administration Commissioner, in amount of $3,049.68. Motions terminated: 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Mitch Enos.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 28, 2008. (ct)
April 9, 2008 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Mitch Enos. (Brooks, Evelyn)
April 7, 2008 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Order in Kimer, 06-5178, # 2 Exhibit 2 Magistrate's Report and Recommendation Kimer, 06-5178)(Hawkins, Claude)
April 4, 2008 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Mitch Enos. (Brooks, Evelyn)
April 4, 2008 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Mitch Enos. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-(1)-Memorandum Opinion, # 2 Exhibit A-(2)-Judgment, # 3 Exhibit B-Timesheet, # 4 Exhibit C-Consumer Price Index)(Brooks, Evelyn)
January 10, 2008 10 JUDGMENT REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 10, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct) Modified on 1/11/2008 to change docket text to (ct).
January 10, 2008 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 10, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
July 25, 2007 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
July 2, 2007 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Mitch Enos. (Brooks, Evelyn)
June 4, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff's SSA brief is due within 30 days of the filing of the transcript and the Commissioner will have 30 days to respond. If plaintiff does not file a brief within the 30 days, the defendant will have 30 days from the date on which plaintiff's brief would be due in which to submit a brief. The brief should be no longer than 20 pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 06/04/2007. (caz)
June 4, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 7/4/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 8/3/2007. (mfr)
June 1, 2007 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
May 10, 2007 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Mitch Enos. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 4/11/2007, answer due 6/11/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to Chief Councel# 2 Exhibit B-Certified Mail Receipts)(Brooks, Evelyn) Modified on 5/11/2007 to correct filers (jn).
April 12, 2007 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on April 12, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
April 6, 2007 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
April 6, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application filed by Mitch Enos and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 4/2/07. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 4/4/07. (ct)
April 6, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Mitch Enos. (ct)
April 6, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Mitch Enos. Filed nunc pro tunc as of April 2, 2007(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enos v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitch Enos
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Claude S. Hawkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?