Holland v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Victoria G. Holland
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05068
Filed: April 16, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 2, 2008 13 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Victoria G. Holland against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on May 2, 2008. (tg)
April 24, 2008 12 RESPONSE to Motion re 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 14, 2008 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Victoria G. Holland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Consumer Price Index, # 2 Affidavit of Counsel, # 3 Exhibit "A" - time before court & SSA, # 4 Exhibit "A-1" - time before the court)(Spencer, Frederick)
April 14, 2008 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA by Victoria G. Holland. (Spencer, Frederick)
January 15, 2008 9 Featured Case ORDER reversing the decision of the Commissioner and remanding case for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g) ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 15, 2008. (tg)
January 15, 2008 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 15, 2008. (tg)
October 10, 2007 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
September 10, 2007 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on September 10, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent# 2 Government's Consent)(dkg)
September 10, 2007 5 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Victoria G. Holland. (Spencer, Frederick)
August 10, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or September 10, 2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on August 10, 2007. (lmg)
August 9, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 9/10/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/8/2007. (mfr)
August 9, 2007 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
May 2, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case referral reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant. Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jn)
April 16, 2007 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
April 16, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as April 5, 2007, and granting 2 Application to proceed IFP filed by Victoria G. Holland. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on April 11, 2007. (tg)
April 16, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceed IFP by Plaintiff Victoria G. Holland. (tg)
April 16, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner to be filed nunc pro tunc as of April 5, 2007, filed by Victoria G. Holland. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Decision# 2 Exhibit B Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria G. Holland
Represented By: Frederick S. Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Claude S. Hawkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?