Chronister v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Luther E. Chronister
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05072
Filed: April 20, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2008 14 JUDGMENT REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. The decision of the Commissioner is reversed and remanded to the Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 23, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/ R&R(ct)
September 30, 2008 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Luther E. Chronister. Objections to R&R due by 10/20/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 30, 2008. (ct)
March 31, 2008 12 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
February 28, 2008 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Luther E. Chronister. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 30, 2008 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/28/2008.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 01/30/2008. (caz)
January 29, 2008 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (mfr)
January 29, 2008 10 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
December 11, 2007 9 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion to Reopen Case and directing the defendant to answer within 60 days. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 11, 2007. (ct)
December 10, 2007 8 MOTION to Reopen Case by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(Hawkins, Claude)
July 3, 2007 7 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY for further consideration pursuant to sentence 6. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on July 3, 2007. cc: OH&A & ALJ(ct)
July 3, 2007 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 7/3/07. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
June 22, 2007 5 MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
April 30, 2007 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
April 20, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Luther E. Chronister and directing 1 Complaint filed by Luther E. Chronister to be filed nunc pro tunc as of 4/12/07; Motions terminated: 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Luther E. Chronister . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 4/12/07. (ct)
April 20, 2007 3 AFFIDAVIT of Luther Chronister filed by Luther E. Chronister re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
April 20, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Luther E. Chronister. (ct)
April 20, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Luther E. Chronister. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 4/12/07 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chronister v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luther E. Chronister
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Claude S. Hawkins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?