Taylor v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Paul S Taylor
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05106
Filed: June 8, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2008 14 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. in favor of Paul B Taylor against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 1, 2008. (ct)
September 30, 2008 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
September 22, 2008 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Under EAJA by Paul B Taylor. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Fitting, Lawrence)
September 22, 2008 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Paul B Taylor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Employment Agreement)(Fitting, Lawrence)
July 3, 2008 10 Featured Case ORDER reversing decision of Commissioner and REMANDING CASE for further consideration. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 3, 2008. (ct)
July 3, 2008 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 3, 2008. (ct)
October 24, 2007 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 15, 2007 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Paul B Taylor. (Fitting, Lawrence)
September 17, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or October 15, 2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on September 17, 2007. (lmg)
September 13, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/15/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/12/2007. (cap)
September 10, 2007 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
August 8, 2007 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for complaint and summons, filed by Paul B Taylor. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/17/2007, answer due 9/17/2007. (rw)
August 1, 2007 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on August 1, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent# 2 Government's Consent)(dkg)
July 12, 2007 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT Case reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant (referral). Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jn)
June 8, 2007 4 Summons Issued all directed to Michael J. Astrue, Commissioner c/o Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region IV, 1301 Young Street, Room 430, Dallas, TX 75202-5433(ct)
June 8, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Application to proceed ifp filed by Paul B Taylor,and directing clerk to file 1 Complaint filed by Paul S Taylor. The complaint is to be entered nunc pro tunc as of 6/5/07. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 7/6/07. (ct) Modified on 8/1/2007 (tg).
June 8, 2007 2 APPLICATION to proceedf IFP by Plaintiff Paul B. Taylor. (ct) Modified on 8/1/2007 to correct name(tg).
June 8, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Paul B Taylor. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 6/5/07(ct) Modified on 8/1/2007 to correct name(tg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul S Taylor
Represented By: Lawrence W Fitting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?