Adair v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Bethel Adair
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05127
Filed: July 19, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2008 16 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS/JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees, in favor of Bethel Adair against Social Security Administration Commissioner in amount of $2,138.08. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 24, 2008. (ct)
May 29, 2008 15 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Bethel Adair. Objections to R&R due by 6/16/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 29, 2008. (ct)
May 16, 2008 14 Featured Case RESPONSE to Motion re 12 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
May 14, 2008 Featured Case CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski for ruling on attorney fees. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(ct)
May 13, 2008 13 Featured Case MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 12 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Bethel Adair. (Cazort, Mildred)
May 13, 2008 12 Featured Case First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Bethel Adair. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B EAJA Billing, # 3 Exhibit C Consumer Index Price)(Cazort, Mildred)
February 8, 2008 11 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and reversing the decision of the Commisioner and remanding case for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 8, 2008. cc: ALJ & OHA w/R&R(tg)
January 14, 2008 10 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION to Remand filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Objections to R&R due by 2/1/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 14, 2008. (tg)
January 10, 2008 9 Featured Case MOTION to Remand by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 2, 2008 8 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to File and allowing defendant until 1/16/08 to file brief. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 2, 2008. (ct)
December 17, 2007 7 Featured Case MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Brief by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(Hawkins, Claude)
November 16, 2007 6 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Bethel Adair. (Cazort, Mildred)
October 16, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 11/16/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 10/16/2007. (cla)
October 16, 2007 Featured Case This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/15/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/17/2007. (mfr)
October 16, 2007 5 Featured Case ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
August 29, 2007 Featured Case 4 Summons Re-Issued as to Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg) Modified on 8/29/2007 to add text(tg).
August 9, 2007 Featured Case 4 Summons Issued as to Office of Regional Chief Counsel, Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
July 19, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of July 6, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on July 16, 2007. (ct)
July 19, 2007 3 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT/ADDENDUM by Bethel Adair to 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
July 19, 2007 2 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bethel Adair. (ct)
July 19, 2007 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Bethel Adair. Filed Nunc Pro Tunc as of 7/6/07 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adair v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bethel Adair
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?