Rector v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Carl Leon Rector
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05130
Filed: July 23, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2008 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 29, 2008. (tg)
December 4, 2008 14 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Carl Leon Rector. Objections to R&R due by 12/22/2008. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 4, 2008. (tg)
December 2, 2008 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 24, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Honorable Barry A. Bryant for ruling on attorney fees. Motions referred to Barry A. Bryant.(ct)
November 21, 2008 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Carl Leon Rector. (Cazort, Mildred)
November 21, 2008 11 First MOTION for Attorney Fees EAJA Attorney Fees by Carl Leon Rector. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Judgment, # 2 Exhibit B EAJA Billing Statement, # 3 Exhibit C Consumer Price Index)(Cazort, Mildred)
October 3, 2008 10 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 3, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/copy of R&R(tg)
September 4, 2008 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Carl Leon Rector. Objections to R&R due by 9/22/2008. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 4, 2008. (tg)
September 4, 2008 8 ***DISREGARD REDOCKETED TO CORRECT EVENT*** ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on September 4, 2008. (tg) Modified on 9/5/2008 to add text(tg).
January 29, 2008 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 8, 2008 6 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Carl Leon Rector. (Cazort, Mildred)
December 6, 2007 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or January 8, 2008. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on December 6, 2007. (lmg)
December 6, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 1/8/2008. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/7/2008. (cap)
December 3, 2007 5 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
September 11, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
August 6, 2007 TEXT ONLY ENTRY-MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case referral Reassigned to Judge Barry A. Bryant. Judge James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
July 23, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of July 16, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on July 18, 2007. (tg)
July 23, 2007 3 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carl Leon Rector. (tg)
July 23, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carl Leon Rector. (tg)
July 23, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner to be filed nunc pro tunc as of July 16, 2007 filed by Carl Leon Rector. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rector v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Leon Rector
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?