Herling v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Amanda J Herling
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05138
Filed: August 7, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2008 20 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Amanda J Herling against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 19, 2008. (tg)
September 10, 2008 19 RESPONSE to Motion re 17 First MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
September 2, 2008 18 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 17 First MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA by Gary Herling. (McKinnon, Laura)
September 2, 2008 17 First MOTION for Attorney Fees under EAJA by Gary Herling. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Itemization of Attorney Fees)(McKinnon, Laura)
June 3, 2008 16 JUDGMENT reversing decision of the Commissioner and remanding case for further consideration pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 3, 2008. cc: OH&A, ALJ(tg)
June 3, 2008 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on June 3, 2008. (tg)
May 29, 2008 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion to Substitute Party. Gary Herling added. Amanda J Herling terminated. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 29, 2008. (tg)
May 20, 2008 13 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by Amanda J Herling. (McKinnon, Laura)
May 9, 2008 12 Featured Case ORDER directing plaintiff to file a motion for extension of time to file motion to substitute by 5/21/08, with further instructions by the court. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on May 9, 2008. (ct)
April 23, 2008 11 First MOTION to Substitute Party by Amanda J Herling. (McKinnon, Laura)
April 16, 2008 10 Featured Case ORDER directing counsel to review the record and provide the Court with the name of a suitable substitute for plaintiff on or before April 28, 2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 16, 2008. (tg)
December 3, 2007 9 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
November 5, 2007 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Amanda J Herling. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff death certificate re suicide)(McKinnon, Laura)
October 12, 2007 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Amanda J Herling. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 8/21/2007, answer due 10/22/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Green Card to Alberto Gonzales# 2 Exhibit Green Card to Mr. Hawkins# 3 Exhibit Green card to Michael J. Astrue)(McKinnon, Laura)
October 5, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or 11/05/2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on 10/05/2007. (caz)
October 4, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiff's SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/5/2007. Government's SSA Appeal Brief due by 12/3/2007. (mfr)
October 4, 2007 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
August 20, 2007 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Marschewski. Signed by Judge Jimm Larry Hendren on August 20, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit government's consent)(djm)
August 7, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
August 7, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file the complaint Nunc Pro Tunc as of 7/31/07. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on August 3, 2007. (ct)
August 7, 2007 3 AFFIDAVIT of Amanda J Herling filed by Amanda J Herling re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
August 7, 2007 2 MOTION (PETITION) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Amanda J Herling. (ct)
August 7, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Amanda J Herling. Filed Nunc Pro Tunc as of 7/31/07(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herling v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda J Herling
Represented By: Laura J. McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?