McConnell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Jimmy A McConnell
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05149
Filed: August 20, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2008 10 Featured Case JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and affirming decision of the the Aadministrative Law Judge. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 8, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A (ct) Modified on 9/8/2008 to add docket text (ct). Modified on 9/8/2008 (ct).
August 25, 2008 9 Featured Case OBJECTION(S) by Social Security Administration Commissioner re 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Jimmy A McConnell.. (Hawkins, Claude)
August 18, 2008 8 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Jimmy A McConnell. Objections to R&R due by 9/5/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 8/18/08. (ct)
March 3, 2008 7 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
February 12, 2008 6 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Jimmy A McConnell. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 14, 2008 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/11/2008.Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 01/14/2008. (cla)
January 11, 2008 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/11/2008.Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 01/11/2008. (cla)
January 11, 2008 Featured Case This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (mfr)
January 10, 2008 5 Featured Case ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
November 8, 2007 Featured Case Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service. Mag notice attached. (ct)
August 20, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 8/10/07. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on August 20, 2007. (ct)
August 20, 2007 3 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of Jimmy A. McConnell filed by Jimmy A McConnell re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
August 20, 2007 2 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmy A McConnell. (ct)
August 20, 2007 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Jimmy A McConnell. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 8/10/07 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McConnell v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy A McConnell
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?