Sutton v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Jim W. Sutton
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05158
Filed: September 18, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 23, 2009 18 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and affirming the decision of the ALJ and dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 23, 2009. (tg)
January 20, 2009 17 Featured Case REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Jim W. Sutton. Objections to R&R due by 2/6/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 20, 2009. (tg)
November 17, 2008 16 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT filed by Jim W. Sutton. (Cazort, Mildred)
November 3, 2008 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 3, 2008. (tg)
November 3, 2008 14 Featured Case First MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Jim W. Sutton. (Cazort, Mildred)
October 30, 2008 13 Featured Case ORDER directing plaintiff to show cause why case should not be dismissed for failure to file affidavit as directed by the court by November 5, 2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 30, 2008. (tg)
October 7, 2008 12 Featured Case ORDER directing plaintiff to provide the Court with an affidavit indicating his exact current address and his address the date the complaint was filed on September 28, 2007. Plaintiff should indicate how long he stayed with his daughter and proof of residency in the State of Arkansas. Plaintiff is to provide this information to the court by October 21, 2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 7, 2008. (tg)
October 2, 2008 11 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT filed by Jim W. Sutton. (jn)
September 26, 2008 10 Featured Case ORDER directing plaintiff to file an affidavit indicating exact current address and address the date that the complaint was filed on 9/28/07. Affidavit to be filed by 10/2/08. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 26, 2008. (ct)
March 26, 2008 9 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
February 25, 2008 8 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Jim W. Sutton. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 24, 2008 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/25/2008.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 01/24/2008. (caz)
January 24, 2008 Featured Case This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (rw)
January 24, 2008 7 Featured Case ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
November 20, 2007 Featured Case 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (jn)
September 18, 2007 6 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of September 11, 2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on September 12, 2007. (tg)
September 18, 2007 5 Featured Case MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 4 MOTION for Leave to proceed in forma pauperis by Jim W. Sutton. (tg) Modified on 9/19/2007 to correct text(tg).
September 18, 2007 4 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to proceed in forma pauperis by Jim W. Sutton. (tg) Modified on 9/19/2007 to correct text (tg).
September 18, 2007 3 Featured Case DISREGARD ENTRY INCORRECT EVENT USED MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 2 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jim W. Sutton. (tg) Modified on 9/18/2007 to add text(tg).
September 18, 2007 2 Featured Case DISREGARD ENTRY INCORRECT EVENT USED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jim W. Sutton. (tg) Modified on 9/18/2007 to add text(tg).
September 18, 2007 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner to be filed nunc pro tunc as of September 11, 2007, filed by Jim W. Sutton. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action)(tg) Modified on 9/18/2007 to add text (tg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim W. Sutton
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?