White v. Social Security Commissioner

Plaintiff: Larry W. White
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05181
Filed: October 12, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2009 20 Featured Case ORDER on Attorney Fees in favor of Larry W. White against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on April 30, 2009. (tg)
April 7, 2009 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Larry W. White. Objections to R&R due by 4/24/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on April 7, 2009. (jn)
April 2, 2009 18 RESPONSE to Motion re 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 24, 2009 17 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Larry W. White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit CPI Information)(Cazort, Mildred)
March 24, 2009 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Larry W. White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EAJA Billing Cost)Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(Cazort, Mildred)
March 24, 2009 CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(tg)
March 23, 2009 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support EAJA Billing by Larry W. White. (Cazort, Mildred)
March 23, 2009 14 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Larry W. White. (Cazort, Mildred)
January 14, 2009 13 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on January 14, 2009. (tg)
December 22, 2008 12 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Larry W. White. Objections to R&R due by 1/12/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 22, 2008. (tg)
November 7, 2008 11 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
October 10, 2008 10 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Larry W. White. (Cazort, Mildred)
September 11, 2008 9 Featured Case ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 11, 2008. (tg)
September 10, 2008 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Larry W. White re 7 Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Declaration Claimant's Attorney, Mima Cazort)(Cazort, Mildred)
September 2, 2008 7 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why case should not be dismissed for failure to file appeal brief. Show Cause Response due by 9/23/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on September 2, 2008. (tg)
August 29, 2008 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(Hawkins, Claude)
February 13, 2008 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 3/13/2008.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 02/13/2008. (cla)
February 11, 2008 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (rw)
February 11, 2008 5 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
December 11, 2007 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (jn)
October 12, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing the clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 10/9/07. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 10, 1007. (ct)
October 12, 2007 3 AFFIDAVIT of Larry White filed by Larry W. White re 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (ct)
October 12, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Larry W. White. (ct)
October 12, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Larry W. White, filed by Larry W. White. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Appeals Council Action)(ct) Entered nunc pro tunc as of 10/9/07 Modified on 10/12/2007 to add docket text (ct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Social Security Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry W. White
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?