Olinger v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Lisa Olinger
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05188
Filed: October 30, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2008 12 AMENDED AND SUBSTITUTED JUDGMENT re: 10 JUDGMENT Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order Remanding Case to US Agency, Motions terminated: 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order Remanding Case to US Agency filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner.. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 21, 2008. CC: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
October 6, 2008 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct 10 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations, Order Remanding Case to US Agency by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
September 8, 2008 10 JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND REMANDING CASE to commissioner for further consideration. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 8, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/copy of R&R(ct)
August 11, 2008 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Lisa Olinger. Objections to R&R due by 8/28/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 11, 2008. (tg)
April 4, 2008 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
March 5, 2008 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Lisa Olinger. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Submitting Dr. Price's Opinion, # 2 Exhibit Martin Fax with OGC letter)(McKinnon, Laura)
February 4, 2008 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief. Plaintiff's brief is now due March 5, 2008, and the Defendant's brief will be due on April 4, 2008.Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 02/04/2008. (cla)
February 4, 2008 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appeal Brief by Lisa Olinger. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(McKinnon, Laura)
January 9, 2008 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/7/2008.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 01/09/2008. (caz)
January 8, 2008 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (mfr)
January 8, 2008 5 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
October 30, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (tg)
October 30, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file complaint nunc pro tunc as of October 23, 2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on October 25, 2007. (tg) Modified on 10/30/2007 to add text(tg).
October 30, 2007 3 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lisa Olinger. (tg)
October 30, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lisa Olinger. (tg)
October 30, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner to be filed nunc pro tunc as of October 23, 2007, filed by Lisa Olinger.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olinger v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Olinger
Represented By: Laura J. McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?