Grimm v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Debra Lynne Grimm
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05196
Filed: November 2, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2009 14 Featured Case JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Debra Lynne Grimm against Social Security Administration Commissioner. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on February 5, 2009. (tg)
February 4, 2009 13 Featured Case RESPONSE to Motion re 11 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
January 22, 2009 Featured Case Case no longer referred to Honorable James R. Marschewski per previous consent to Magistrate Bryant. (jn)
January 22, 2009 Featured Case CASE REFERRED to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(tg)
January 21, 2009 12 Featured Case MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Debra Lynne Grimm. (Brooks, Evelyn)
January 21, 2009 11 Featured Case MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs under the Equal Access to Justice Act by Debra Lynne Grimm. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (1) Memorandum Opinion, # 2 Exhibit A (2) Judgment, # 3 Exhibit B-Timesheet, # 4 Exhibit C-Consumer Price Index)(Brooks, Evelyn)
October 29, 2008 10 Featured Case JUDGMENT reversing decision of commissioner and REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 29, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct) Modified on 10/29/2008 to add text (ct)
October 29, 2008 9 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on October 29, 2008. cc: ALJ & OH&A(ct)
February 26, 2008 8 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
February 12, 2008 7 Featured Case APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Debra Lynne Grimm. (Brooks, Evelyn)
January 14, 2008 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/13/2008.Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on January 14, 2008. (lmg)
January 14, 2008 Featured Case This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (cap)
January 10, 2008 6 Featured Case ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
December 4, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Honorable Barry A. Bryant. Honorable James R. Marschewski no longer assigned to the case. (jn)
November 26, 2007 5 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Debra Lynne Grimm. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 11/15/2007, answer due 1/14/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter to Chief Counsel, # 2 Exhibit B-Certified Mail Receipts)(Brooks, Evelyn)
November 21, 2007 4 Featured Case CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 21, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
November 2, 2007 Featured Case 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
November 2, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 10/29/07. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on November 2, 2007. (ct)
November 2, 2007 2 Featured Case MOTION (APPLICATION) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Debra Lynne Grimm. (ct)
November 2, 2007 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Debra Lynne Grimm. Filed nunc pro tunc as of 10/29/07(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimm v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Lynne Grimm
Represented By: Evelyn Elizabeth Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?