Lacy v. Ferguson et al

Plaintiff: Brandon Eugene Lacy
Defendant: Keith Ferguson and Hunter Petray
Case Number: 5:2007cv05200
Filed: November 6, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing case with prejudice ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on November 23, 2009. (tg)
March 17, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 38 and granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant Keith Ferguson is dismissed. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 17, 2009. (jn)
February 26, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 18 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hunter Petray, Larkin, Keith Ferguson, Hernandez, Bryson, Duncan. Objections to R&R due by 3/16/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 26, 2009. (jn)
November 6, 2007 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER provisionally filing complaint prior to determination regarding plaintiff's status as a pauper and service of process. Clerk is directed to provide the plaintiff with an in forma pauperis application to complete by November 30, 2007. Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on November 1, 2007. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lacy v. Ferguson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Eugene Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunter Petray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?