Raynor v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Jimmie L. Raynor
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2007cv05202
Filed: November 7, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Madison
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2008 10 JUDGMENT re 9 Memorandum Opinion, affirming decision of commissioner and dismissing case w/prejudice. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 14, 2008. (ct)
August 14, 2008 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on August 14, 2008. (ct)
February 21, 2008 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Hawkins, Claude)
February 8, 2008 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Jimmie L. Raynor. (Angel, Michael)
January 9, 2008 TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 2/8/2008.. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on 01/09/2008. (caz)
January 9, 2008 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (mfr)
January 9, 2008 6 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Hawkins, Claude)
November 28, 2007 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jimmie L. Raynor. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 11/15/2007, answer due 1/14/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Return receipts)(Angel, Michael)
November 21, 2007 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 21, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit-plaintiff's consent; # 2 Exhibit-government's consent)(djm)
November 7, 2007 3 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney/plaintiff for service (ct)
November 7, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and directing clerk to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 10/31/07. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge James R. Marschewski on November 6, 2007. (ct)
November 7, 2007 2 MOTION (APPLICATION) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jimmie L. Raynor. (ct)
November 7, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner , filed by Jimmie L. Raynor.(ct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raynor v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie L. Raynor
Represented By: Michael C. Angel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?