Chappell v. Helder et al
Plaintiff: Daniel A. Chappell
Defendant: Timothy Helder and Washington County, Arkansas
Case Number: 5:2007cv05219
Filed: December 3, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JUDGMENT in favor of Daniel A. Chappell against Washington County, Arkansas, Timothy Helder, ORDER ADOPTING 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and directing Washington County Detention Center to file proposed revised policies by 3/22/2010. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 1, 2010. (src)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Daniel A. Chappell. Objections to R&R due by 12/31/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on December 14, 2009. (tg)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations 26 . ORDER REFERRING CASE to Honorable James R. Marschewski. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 23, 2009. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(src)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy Helder, Washington County, Arkansas. Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 25, 2009. (tg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chappell v. Helder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel A. Chappell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Helder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County, Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?