Reese v. Reyes et al

Case Number: 5:2007cv05227
Filed: December 11, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 10, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 84 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. ORDER denying 86 Motion Of Indigent Order From The Judge Allowing The Plaintiff The Transcript Of The Court Hearing. Case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 10, 2010. (src)
March 12, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; adopting Report and Recommendations 51 in toto; terminating motion 52 to Amend/Correct deemed objections to the R&R. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on March 12, 2009. (src)
March 2, 2009 51 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Keith - Ferguson, Hunter Petray, Reyes and Thompson. Objections to R&R due by 3/19/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on February 26, 2009. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. Reyes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?