Benjamin v. Chandler et al
Plaintiff: Michael Benjamin
Defendant: S. Chandler, Dan Doody and Tim Helder
Case Number: 5:2008cv05134
Filed: June 17, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Presiding Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying 48 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; denying 50 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; denying 52 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; adopting Report and Recommendations re 53 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on October 28, 2010. (tg)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 48 52 50 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis, recommending the IFP applications be denied. Objections to R&R due by 10/25/2010. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on October 6, 2010. (src)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING 42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and finding as moot 45 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 6, 2010. (src)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 22 re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Michael Benjamin. The following claims are dismissed: the false arrest, malicious prosecution, and false imprisonment claims; all claims against Mayor Dan Coody; and all claims against Sheriff Tim Helder. The remaining claim of Benjamin's illegal search is referred back to Judge Marscheski for a report and recommendation. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 1, 2009. Motions referred to James R. Marschewski.(sh)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Michael Benjamin, recommends all claims against Mayor Dan Coody and Sheriff Tim Helder be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 4/2/2009. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on March 16, 2009. (src)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Michael Benjamin,allowing plaintiff until 12/12/08 to complete and file the addendum to complaint. The clerk is directed to provide plaintiff with another copy of the addendum 10 . Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on November 20, 2008. (case not re-referred to magistrate judge)(ct)
October 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Michael Benjamin. Objections to R&R due by 10/27/2008. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on October 7, 2008. (ct)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin v. Chandler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Benjamin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Doody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Helder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?