Sligar v. Social Security Commissioner

Plaintiff: Bobby D. Sligar
Defendant: Social Security Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2008cv05189
Filed: August 22, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Bobby D. Sligar against Social Security Commissioner, ORDER ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 7, 2009. (src)
November 13, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 10 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Bobby D. Sligar. Objections to R&R due by 12/3/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 13, 2009. (src)
August 18, 2009 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 18, 2009. cc: ALJ & OH&A w/R&R (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sligar v. Social Security Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby D. Sligar
Represented By: Lawrence W Fitting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?