Pichon v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Joseph Pichon, Jr.
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2009cv05011
Filed: January 13, 2009
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: James R. Marschewski
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:0405g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Joseph Pichon, Jr against Social Security Administration Commissioner, ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 16 Report and Recommendations, 13 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Joseph Pichon, Jr. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on May 11, 2010. (src)
February 12, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 11 and ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY pursuant to sentence four of 42 USC 405(g). Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on February 12, 2010. (copy to ALJ & OHA with R&R)(jn)
January 20, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 Complaint filed by Joseph Pichon, Jr. Objections to R&R due by 2/8/2010. Signed by Honorable James R. Marschewski on January 20, 2010. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pichon v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Pichon, Jr.
Represented By: Mildred M Cazort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?