Wilmoth v. Lockhart et al

Plaintiff: Michael Shane Wilmoth
Defendant: Lockhart, Vaughn, Frischman, Jessen, Dowdle, Hernandez, Robbins, Carlton, Lowther, Aramark Correctional Services, LLC, Barbara Hardwick, John Huskins and Benton County Sheriff's Office Law Librarian
Case Number: 5:2010cv05048
Filed: March 5, 2010
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Benton
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: Erin L. Setser
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2012 179 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 164 Report and Recommendations and denying 96 Motion for Summary Judgment of Aramark Correctional Services, LLC, and Barbara Hardwick. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 27, 2012. (tg)
September 11, 2012 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 166 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting 140 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $3,287.85. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 11, 2012. (tg)
September 7, 2012 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 165 Report and Recommendations. The Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis (document #60) is denied. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 7, 2012. (adw)
June 27, 2012 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and granting 105 Motion to Dismiss Party; Party Dowdle, Frischman, Hernandez, Jessen, Lockhart, Lowther, Hunter Petray, Robbins, Strickland, Vaughn, Wales, Carlton and Carter Terminated. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 27, 2012. (tg)
September 15, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion to Dismiss and adopting 88 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on September 15, 2011. (adw)
December 21, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 19 in toto for 11 Motion for Relief filed by Michael Shane Wilmoth. Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief denied. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on December 21, 2010. (jas)
November 30, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 11 MOTION for Relief filed by Michael Shane Wilmoth. Objections to R&R due by 12/17/2010. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Setser on November 30, 2010. (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmoth v. Lockhart et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shane Wilmoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frischman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dowdle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Correctional Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Hardwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Huskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton County Sheriff's Office Law Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?