Bower v. Putman et al

Plaintiff: Richard Bower
Defendant: John Putman, Ron Kincade, John Montgomery and Brad Lewis
Case Number: 5:2012cv05058
Filed: April 2, 2012
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jimm Larry Hendren
Referring Judge: Erin L. Setser
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 10 Report and Recommendations and ORDER denying 9 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on August 16, 2012. (src) Modified on 8/17/2012 (src).
June 27, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and denying 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Jimm Larry Hendren on June 27, 2012. (tg)
April 2, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that the interests of justice would be best served by transferring this case, the Clerk is directed to immediately transfer this action to the USDC for the Western District of Arkansas, Fayetteville Division. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/2/12. (vjt) [Transferred from ared on 4/2/2012.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bower v. Putman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Putman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Kincade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?