3A Composites USA, Inc. v. United Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: 3A Composites USA, Inc.
Defendant: United Industries, Inc. and Wesley Paulin
Case Number: 5:2014cv05147
Filed: May 15, 2014
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: U.S., Outside State
Presiding Judge: Timothy L. Brooks
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 24, 2016 140 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 137 Motion for Attorney Fees. 3A is therefore ORDERED to pay these fees and costs, totaling $57,021.58, to Defendants within twenty days of the entry of this Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in 3A's Complaint in the new case being stricken; see order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 24, 2016. (rg)
November 10, 2015 129 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part motions 100 Motion to Exclude, 113 Motion to Seal and 105 MOTION in Limine . Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 10, 2015. (rg) Modified on 11/10/2015 modify text (rg). Modified on 11/12/2015 to correct document type (jn).
September 15, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER; granting in part and denying in part 68 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 15, 2015. (rg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3A Composites USA, Inc. v. United Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3A Composites USA, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Cabell Clay(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Daniel L. Gude
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Represented By: Paul J. Peralta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Industries, Inc.
Represented By: L. Kyle Heffley
Represented By: Lester Kyle Heffley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Paulin
Represented By: Edward B. Davis
Represented By: L. Kyle Heffley
Represented By: Brian D. Malkmus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?