J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Vega

Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Edward Vega
Case Number: 5:2015cv05199
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Timothy L. Brooks
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0553
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 4, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 38 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 4, 2016. (rg)
August 2, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Amend/Correct, Third Amended Answer may be filed by no later than August 4, 2016; See order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 2, 2016. (rg)
February 16, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER finding as moot 13 Motion to Strike and 22 Motion for Leave to File; granting 11 Response/Motion to Extend Deadline ; denying 20 Motion to Strike. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 16, 2016. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?