McIlvain v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Brenda M. McIlvain
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2016cv05359
Filed: December 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Timothy L. Brooks
Presiding Judge: Erin L. Setser
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:0405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER on Attorney Fees in favor of Brenda M. McIlvain against Social Security Administration Commissioner in the amount of $4,876.65. This amount should be paid in addition to, and not out of, any past due benefits which plaintiff may be awarded in the future. Further, any EAJA award by this Court should be made payable to plaintiff and not counsel. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 8, 2017. (tg)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER adopting 13 Report and Recommendations in its entirety and granting 12 Motion to Remand. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 6, 2017. (rg)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 Unopposed MOTION to Remand filed by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Objections to R&R due by 6/19/2017. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on June 5, 2017. (rg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIlvain v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda M. McIlvain
Represented By: Laura J. McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?