Whaley et al v. Esebag et al
Plaintiff: M. Sean Hatch, Jodie Daniels, Ron Whaley, Justin Whaley, Tom Maddi, Michael Bahn and Rodney Redman
Defendant: United Licensing Group, Inc. and Jimmy Esebag
Case Number: 5:2018cv05123
Filed: June 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fayetteville Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Filing 26 AMENDED MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #13 Motion to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Abstain by Jimmy Esebag, United Licensing Group, Inc.. (Crass, Kevin) Modified on 8/22/2018 to add link (tg).
August 15, 2018 Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting in part and denying in part #24 Motion to Extend Briefing Deadlines. Any response to Defendant's #13 motion to dismiss is due by September 10, 2018. Defendants may renew their motion for leave to file a reply thereafter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 15, 2018. (rab)
August 15, 2018 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Extend Briefing Deadlines on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Michael Bahn, Jodie Daniels, M. Sean Hatch, Tom Maddi, Rodney Redman, Justin Whaley, Ron Whaley. (Pekron, Chad)
August 15, 2018 Filing 23 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jeffrey C. Berman is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 15, 2018. (jas)
August 15, 2018 Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Peter W. Ross is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER if he has not already done so and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 15, 2018. (jas)
August 14, 2018 Filing 21 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.EXHIBIT 2 by Jimmy Esebag, United Licensing Group, Inc.. An Order was entered on 8/14/2018 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to #14 Memorandum Brief in Support. (Crass, Kevin) Modified on 8/17/2018 to edit text (tg). Modified on 8/20/2018 (lw).
August 14, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney Jeffrey C. Berman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1762077) by Jimmy Esebag, United Licensing Group, Inc.. (Crass, Kevin)
August 14, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney Peter W. Ross to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1762058) by Jimmy Esebag, United Licensing Group, Inc.. (Crass, Kevin)
August 14, 2018 Filing 18 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/20/2018. Jury Trial set for 7/15/2019 at 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 14, 2018. (jas)
August 14, 2018 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave. Defendants may file exhibit 2 of their motion to dismiss with access restricted to the Court and the parties. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 14, 2018. (rab)
August 13, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION Maintain Access Restriction on Complaint re #1 MOTION to Seal Document by Jimmy Esebag, United Licensing Group, Inc.. (Crass, Kevin)
August 13, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Jimmy Esebag, United Licensing Group, Inc.. (Crass, Kevin)
August 13, 2018 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Abstain MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jimmy Esebag, United Licensing Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of J. Esebag)(Crass, Kevin)
August 13, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Abstain, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jimmy Esebag, United Licensing Group, Inc.. (Crass, Kevin)
August 1, 2018 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for Defendants to file a responsive pleading or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to August 13, 2018. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on August 1, 2018. (rab)
August 1, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Complaint by Jimmy Esebag, United Licensing Group, Inc.. (Crass, Kevin)
August 1, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A. Crass on behalf of Jimmy Esebag, United Licensing Group, Inc.. (Crass, Kevin)
July 18, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by All Plaintiffs. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Pekron, Chad)
June 27, 2018 Filing 8 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jimmy Esebag, et al, filed by Jodie Daniels, et al.(tg) (tg).
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1 Motion to Seal Document. See Order for specifics. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes, III on June 27, 2018. (tg)
June 27, 2018 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Jimmy Esebag, United Licensing Group, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (src)
June 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ryan Younger on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Younger, Robert)
June 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by E. B. Chiles, IV on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Chiles, E.)
June 27, 2018 Complaint filing fee paid re #1 MOTION to Seal Document : $ 400, receipt number 0861-1735061.. (Pekron, Chad)
June 26, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished. (tg)
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Michael Bahn, Jodie Daniels, M. Sean Hatch, Tom Maddi, Rodney Redman, Justin Whaley, Ron Whaley. (tg)
June 26, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to File Complaint Instanter Under Seal by Michael Bahn, Jodie Daniels, M. Sean Hatch, Tom Maddi, Rodney Redman, Justin Whaley, Ron Whaley. (tg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2018: #1 UNDER SEAL) (tg). Modified on 6/27/2018 (src).
June 26, 2018 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiffs Michael Bahn, Jodie Daniels, M. Sean Hatch, Tom Maddi, Rodney Redman, Justin Whaley, Ron Whaley. Motion to Seal Document #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: E.B. Chiles IV and R.Ryan Younger. (tg)
June 26, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 MOTION to Seal Document. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 6/28/2018 (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whaley et al v. Esebag et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M. Sean Hatch
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie Daniels
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Whaley
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Whaley
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Maddi
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bahn
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Redman
Represented By: Chad W. Pekron
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Licensing Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy Esebag
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?