Reynolds v. Tyson Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ericka Reynolds
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv05168
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case: re #8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case filed by Ericka Reynolds (CASE DISMISSED). (lgd)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Ericka Reynolds with Prejudice. (Parker, Stephen)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Graves, Kathlyn)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 10/24/2018 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/5/2018. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 30, 2018. (slc)
August 28, 2018 Notice of Removal fee received: $ 400, receipt number 5006814. (tg)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished. (tg)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Tyson Foods, Inc.(tg)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed in State Court with Jury Demand against Tyson Foods, Inc., filed by Ericka Reynolds.(tg)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Tyson Foods, Inc. (tg)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington County, case number 72CV-18-2074., filed by Tyson Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynolds v. Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ericka Reynolds
Represented By: Stephen C. Parker, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Kathlyn Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?