Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. vs. Ronda Tester-Rogers, et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Ronda Tester-Rogers and White Star Tavern
Case Number: 5:2018cv05210
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING: Case Management Hearing reset for 2/13/2019 09:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 17, 2018. (slc)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 2/11/2019 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/29/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 4, 2018. (slc)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by White Star Tavern.(Snively, Timothy)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ronda Tester-Rogers.(Snively, Timothy)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 INITIAL REPORT ON THE FILING OF A COPYRIGHT ACTION for a case initiated by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. with the filing of #1 Complaint. (tg)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Ronda Tester-Rogers, White Star Tavern and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (tg)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (tg)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ronda Tester-Rogers, White Star Tavern ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5006862), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. vs. Ronda Tester-Rogers, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronda Tester-Rogers
Represented By: Timothy F. Snively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: White Star Tavern
Represented By: Timothy F. Snively
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly W. McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?