Hampton v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al

Plaintiff: Sheryl Hampton
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2018cv05242
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2019 Filing 16 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines. No reply briefs will be allowed without leave of court. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 4, 2019. (slc)
January 31, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Walters, Jason)
January 31, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston.(Walters, Jason)
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Party: re #12 Joint Stipulation filed by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Party, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Terminated (Dismissed Without Prejudice). (lgd)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. only by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Howard, John)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Allen Walters on behalf of Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Walters, Jason)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Sheryl Hampton. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/29/2019. (Lacy, Brandon)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Sheryl Hampton. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Lacy, Brandon)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Answer or other responsive pleading due 1/29/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 21, 2018. (ee)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Howard, John)
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John Gordon Howard on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Howard, John)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon)
December 7, 2018 Complaint filing fee paid re #1 Complaint : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1830337.. (Lacy, Brandon)
December 7, 2018 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 12/10/2018 (lgd)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Sheryl Hampton. (lgd)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., filed by Sheryl Hampton.(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Jason Allen Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: John Gordon Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Hampton
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?