Story v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.

Plaintiff: Daniel Story
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05004
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Comstock, Christy)
February 1, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Daniel Story. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support)(Placzek, Gregory)
January 18, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Comstock, Christy)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX A - Affidavit of David Houston)(Comstock, Christy)
January 15, 2019 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 3/26/2019 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/11/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on January 15, 2019. (slc)
January 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John F Phillips, IV on behalf of J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Phillips, John)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Comstock, Christy)
January 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc..(Comstock, Christy)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Story. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. served on 1/11/2019, answer due 2/1/2019. (Placzek, Gregory)
January 9, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
January 8, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Placzek, Gregory)
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Daniel Story. (tg)
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5006911), filed by Daniel Story.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Story v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Story
Represented By: Gregory Allen Placzek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: John F Phillips, IV
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?