Leato et al v. Moneygram International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Laurina T. Leato and John M. Leato
Defendant: Moneygram International, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05015
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS FRIVOLOUS. The IFP Motions #2 & #6 are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 28, 2019. (tg)
February 6, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(src)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (tg)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Plaintiffs to both complete, sign and return the Administrative Office 239 Form by February 5, 2019. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on January 29, 2019. (lgd)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form mailed to Petitioner and pro se manual provided. (lgd)
January 28, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(lgd)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (lgd)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (lgd)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Moneygram International, Inc., filed by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leato et al v. Moneygram International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moneygram International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurina T. Leato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Leato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?