Wright v. Bella Vista Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Tracy D. Wright
Defendant: John Doe Officer One, John Doe Officer Two, Bella Vista Police Department, Chief James Graves, Officer Anthony King and Officer Jeremiah Morris
Case Number: 5:2019cv05016
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy D. Wright. Anthony King served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019; Jeremiah Morris served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (lgd)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason B. Kelley on behalf of All Defendants. (Kelley, Jason)
February 26, 2019 Filing 12 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Anthony King, Jeremiah Morris and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #11 Order Directing Service, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Jeremiah Morris, Anthony King and granting 21 days to answer, Jeremiah Morris and Anthony King substituted for John Doe Officer One and John Doe Officer Two. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on February 26, 2019. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(tg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) with Jury Demand by Bella Vista Police Department, James Graves, John Doe Officer One, John Doe Officer Two.(Wilkerson, John)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Wilkerson on behalf of Bella Vista Police Department, James Graves, John Doe Officer One, John Doe Officer Two. (Wilkerson, John)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy D. Wright. James Graves served on 2/5/2019, answer due 2/26/2019. (tg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to James Graves and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #6 Order Directing Service. (tg)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Chief James Graves and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on February 1, 2019. (tg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Fee directing Benton County Detention Center to collect from petitioner's prison account monthly payments in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Benton County ). (tg)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the $350.00 filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on January 28, 2019. (tg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Tracy D. Wright. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (tg) (tg).
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Bella Vista Police Department, John Doe Officer One and John Doe Officer Two, filed by Tracy D. Wright.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Bella Vista Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Officer One
Represented By: John L. Wilkerson
Represented By: Jason B. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Officer Two
Represented By: John L. Wilkerson
Represented By: Jason B. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Vista Police Department
Represented By: John L. Wilkerson
Represented By: Jason B. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief James Graves
Represented By: John L. Wilkerson
Represented By: Jason B. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Anthony King
Represented By: John L. Wilkerson
Represented By: Jason B. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jeremiah Morris
Represented By: John L. Wilkerson
Represented By: Jason B. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy D. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?