Garrison, et al v. Rock Creek Holding, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Osamah A. Bakri and Jacqualynn Garrison
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation/Ocwen Loan Servicing, Chief of Police Jon Simpson, Robert M. Wilson, Leslie N. Mann, Sheriff Sean Holloway, Wade A. Wright, Duetsche Bank National Trust Company and Rock Creek Holding, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv05021
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 18 OPINION AND ORDER granting #8 and #11 Motions to Dismiss; denying as moot #4 Motions for TRO; Motion for Preliminary Injunction and #7 Motion to Exercise Right. Case is Dismissed With Prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 13, 2019. (lgd)
March 5, 2019 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #16 Motion to adopt documents #13 and #14 . Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on March 5, 2019. (smg) Modified on 3/5/2019 to edit text(tg).
February 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION To Adopt and Join Defendant Simpson's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order re #14 Memorandum Brief in Support, #13 Response to Motion by Sean Holloway. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(Davis, JaNan)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Jon Simpson. Amendment to #13 Response to Motion (Exhibits omitted from original filing). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mann, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #13 Response to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction by Jon Simpson. (Mann, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jon Simpson. (Mann, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jon Simpson. (Mann, William)
February 19, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jon Simpson. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(Mann, William)
February 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sean Holloway.(Davis, JaNan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #8 First MOTION to Dismiss by Sean Holloway. (Davis, JaNan)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION to Dismiss by Sean Holloway. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(Davis, JaNan)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION To Exercise Right for Arbitration by Osamah A. Bakri, Jacqualynn Garrison. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(lgd)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER REFERRING CASE to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann for full pretrial and dispositive motions. Motions referred #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 6, 2019. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(ee)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Sean Holloway, Jon Simpson and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. (lgd) Modified on 2/5/2019 to edit text(tg).
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Osamah A. Bakri, Jacqualynn Garrison. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(lgd)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Osamah A. Bakri, Jacqualynn Garrison. (lgd)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Duetsche Bank National Trust Company, Sean Holloway, Leslie N. Mann, Ocwen Financial Corporation/Ocwen Loan Servicing, Rock Creek Holding, LLC, Jon Simpson, Robert M. Wilson, Wade A. Wright ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 5006944), filed by Osamah A. Bakri, Jacqualynn Garrison.(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrison, et al v. Rock Creek Holding, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osamah A. Bakri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqualynn Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Financial Corporation/Ocwen Loan Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Police Jon Simpson
Represented By: William Clark Mann, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie N. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Sean Holloway
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade A. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duetsche Bank National Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rock Creek Holding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?