Cea v. Cobb-Vantress, Inc.

Plaintiff: Martha Cea
Defendant: Cobb-Vantress, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05024
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 20 STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and in the Alternative for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims of Gender and Age Discrimination by Cobb-Vantress, Inc.. (Graves, Kathlyn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Motion to Dismiss and in the Alternative for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims of Gender and Age Discrimination by Cobb-Vantress, Inc.. (Graves, Kathlyn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and in the Alternative for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims of Gender and Age Discrimination by Cobb-Vantress, Inc.. (Graves, Kathlyn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings on Overtime Claims by Cobb-Vantress, Inc.. (Graves, Kathlyn)
March 20, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings on Overtime Claims by Cobb-Vantress, Inc.. (Graves, Kathlyn)
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings due to the filing of the amended complaint #14 . Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 19, 2019. (ee)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #3 Complaint against Cobb-Vantress, Inc. , filed by Martha Cea. Related document: #3 Complaint filed by Martha Cea.(Bailey, Joshua)
March 18, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to file amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 18, 2019. (ee)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Martha Cea. (Bailey, Joshua)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Leave to File an Amended Complaint by Martha Cea. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(Bailey, Joshua)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cobb-Vantress, Inc.. (Graves, Kathlyn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Cobb-Vantress, Inc.. (Graves, Kathlyn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Cobb-Vantress, Inc.. (Graves, Kathlyn)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cobb-Vantress, Inc.. (Graves, Kathlyn)
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 4/9/2019 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/14/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 8, 2019. (slc)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (src)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Cobb-Vantress, Inc..(src)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Cobb-Vantress, Inc., filed by Martha Cea.(src)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Cobb-Vantress, Inc. (src)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Benton County, Arkansas, case number 04 cv 18-3320. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 5006948), filed by Cobb-Vantress, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Complaint)(src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cea v. Cobb-Vantress, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cobb-Vantress, Inc.
Represented By: Kathlyn Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Cea
Represented By: Joshua L. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?