Leato et al v. Assurant, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Laurina T. Leato and John M. Leato
Defendant: Assurant, Inc., American Security Insurance Company and Assurant Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05028
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 OPINION AND ORDER Dismissing Complaint Without Prejudice. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 25, 2019. (lgd)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING that a Supplement to the Complaint containing the correct exhibits be filed. Supplement with correct exhibits is due by 3/4/2019. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on February 14, 2019. (lgd)
February 9, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (tg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (tg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (tg)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Security Insurance Company, Assurant Solutions, Inc., Assurant, Inc., filed by John M. Leato, Laurina T. Leato.(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leato et al v. Assurant, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurant, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurant Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurina T. Leato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Leato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?