Goodner v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Karen Goodner
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv05044
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Robert T Dawson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Bad Faith filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Runyon, Emily)
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #13 Response to Motion by Karen Goodner. (Ingram, Daniel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Bad Faith filed by Karen Goodner. (Ingram, Daniel)
April 9, 2019 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable Robert T. Dawson. Honorable Timothy L. Brooks no longer assigned to the case. (mfr)
March 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily M. Runyon on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Runyon, Emily)
March 28, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Motion to Dismiss #10 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Emily Runyon. (src)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION to Dismiss Bad Faith by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Moore, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Bad Faith by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Moore, John)
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Moore, John)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 4/30/2019 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/9/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 5, 2019. (slc)
March 4, 2019 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1877442.. (Moore, John)
March 4, 2019 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (lgd)
March 4, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/6/2019 (lgd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (lgd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(lgd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Karen Goodner.(lgd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (lgd)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 72CV-18-3004., filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Complaint)(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodner v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: John E. Moore
Represented By: Emily M. Runyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Goodner
Represented By: Daniel L. Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?