Delta Logistics, Inc. v. P.A.M. Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Delta Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: P.A.M. Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05063
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W. George on behalf of Delta Logistics, Inc.. (George, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER terminating #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. In the wake of Defendant's removal of the contested post, Plaintiff indicates that it is no longer seeking preliminary injunctive relief at this time. Therefore, Plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction (Doc. 3) is terminated. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 14, 2019. (kce) Modified on 6/17/2019 (src).
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Delta Logistics, Inc.. (Bowling, Kael)
April 23, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Delta Logistics, Inc.. (Artherton, Angela)
April 23, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by P.A.M. Transport, Inc.. (Comstock, Christy)
April 23, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 7/18/2019 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/10/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 23, 2019. (slc)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by P.A.M. Transport, Inc.. (Comstock, Christy)
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by P.A.M. Transport, Inc..(Comstock, Christy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Delta Logistics, Inc.. P.A.M. Transport, Inc. served on 4/5/2019, answer due 4/26/2019. (Artherton, Angela)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to P.A.M. Transport, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (src)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (src)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to P.A.M. Transport, Inc. for service of the following document: #4 Memorandum Brief in Support, #2 Complaint, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Artherton, Angela)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Delta Logistics, Inc.. (Artherton, Angela)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Delta Logistics, Inc.. (Artherton, Angela)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against P.A.M. Transport. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1893915), filed by Delta Logistics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Artherton, Angela) Corrected party on 4/3/2019 (src).
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Delta Logistics, Inc.. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Logistics, Inc. v. P.A.M. Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A.M. Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Christy Comstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delta Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Represented By: Angela C. Artherton
Represented By: Robert W. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?