Walmart, Inc. et al v. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, et al

Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP
Defendant: Harrison Poultry, Inc., Agri Stats, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Amick Farms, LLC, Perdue Farms, Inc., Foster Poultry Farms, O.K. Industries, Inc. and JCG Foods Of Alabama, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv05100
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Civil Case Transferred from the Western District of Arkansas has been opened in the Northern District Of Illinois as case 1:19-cv-03915 on 6/11/2019. (tg)
June 11, 2019 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Case Transferred to the Northern District of Illinois via Civil Case Extraction. (tg)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF TRANSFER granting #15 Motion to Transfer Case and TRANSFERRING CASE to Northern District of Illinois. Docket Sheet and case documents sent to receiving court. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 11, 2019. (tg)
June 7, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #15 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP, Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Scheduling Order No. 6, #2 Exhibit B - Scheduling Order No. 9 and Case Management Order)(Manne, Neal)
June 7, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP, Walmart, Inc.. (Manne, Neal)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Agri Stats, Inc., Amick Farms, LLC, Case Farms Processing, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Foods, Inc., Claxton Poultry Farms, Inc., Foster Farms, LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, Harrison Poultry, Inc., House of Raeford Farms, Inc., JCG Foods Of Alabama, LLC, JCG Foods Of Georgia, LLC, Koch Foods, Inc., Koch Meat Co., Inc., MAR-JAC Poultry, Inc., Mountaire Farms of Delaware, Inc., Mountaire Farms, Inc., Mountaire Farms, LLC, O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Foods, Inc., O.K. Industries, Inc., PECO Foods, Inc., Perdue Farms, Inc., Perdue Foods, LLC, Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, Sanderson Farms, Inc., Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division), Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division), Wayne Farms, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, et al for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Berger, Eric)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James Patrick Redmon on behalf of Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP, Walmart, Inc.. (Redmon, James)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn J. Rabin on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Rabin, Shawn)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Caughey on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Caughey, Ryan) (tg).
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. RYAN V. CAUGHEY is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 3, 2019. (slc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. PATRICK REDMON is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 3, 2019. (slc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SHAWN J. RABIN is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 3, 2019. (slc)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Ryan V. Caughey to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1924160) by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP, Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berger, Eric)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney Patrick Redmon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1924158) by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP, Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berger, Eric)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney Shawn J. Rabin to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1924155) by Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP, Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berger, Eric)
May 28, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiffs Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP, Walmart, Inc.. Complaint, #2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Ryan Caughey, J. Patrick Redmon, Shawn J Rabin. (src)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1920645), filed by Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP, Sam's East, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Sam's West, Inc..(Berger, Eric)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Walmart, Inc., Sam's East, Inc., Sam's West, Inc., Wal-Mart Louisiana, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas, LLC, Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (lgd) Modified plaintiff's on 5/24/2019 (lgd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walmart, Inc. et al v. Pilgrim's Pride Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harrison Poultry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agri Stats, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Food Division)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pilgrim's Pride Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amick Farms, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perdue Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Poultry Farms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.K. Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JCG Foods Of Alabama, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wal-Mart Stores, East, LP
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Neal Manne
Represented By: Stephen R. Lancaster
Represented By: Eric Berger
Represented By: James Patrick Redmon
Represented By: Shawn J. Rabin
Represented By: Ryan Caughey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?