Yashtinsky v. WalMart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Yashtinsky
Defendant: WalMart, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05105
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:0277
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WalMart, Inc.. (Slawe, Meredith)
July 26, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #23 MOTION to Dismiss by WalMart, Inc.. (Slawe, Meredith)
July 26, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by WalMart, Inc.. (Slawe, Meredith)
June 20, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Meredith Connie Slawe on behalf of WalMart, Inc.. (Slawe, Meredith)
June 19, 2019 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. MEREDITH C. SLAWE is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 19, 2019. (slc)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney Meredith C. Slawe to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1933282), MOTION for Attorney Fees by WalMart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Affidavit)(Freeman, Karen)
June 12, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Ron Marron on behalf of Kevin Yashtinsky. (Marron, Ron)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis Wood on behalf of Kevin Yashtinsky. (Wood, Alexis)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kas Gallucci on behalf of Kevin Yashtinsky. (Gallucci, Kas)
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Responsive Pleading. Defendant's responsive pleading must be filed on or before JULY 26, 2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 12, 2019. (slc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Responsive Pleading by WalMart, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen P Freeman on behalf of WalMart, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. KAS L. GALLUCCI is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 11, 2019. (slc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ALEXIS M. WOOD is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 11, 2019. (slc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. RONALD A. MARRON is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 11, 2019. (slc)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Magistrate Consent Form, filed by Kevin Yashtinsky. WalMart, Inc. served on 6/5/2019, answer due 6/26/2019. (Streett, James)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Attorney KAS L. GALLUCCI to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1929624) by Kevin Yashtinsky. (Streett, James)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney ALEXIS M. WOOD to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1929623) by Kevin Yashtinsky. (Streett, James)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney RONALD A. MARRON to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1929606) by Kevin Yashtinsky. (Streett, James)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joe P Leniski, Jr on behalf of Kevin Yashtinsky. (Leniski, Joe)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to WalMart, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Walmart, Inc. for service of the following document: #3 Complaint. (Streett, James)
May 29, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Kevin Yashtinsky. Complaint #3 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Joe P. Leniski, Jr., Ronald A. Marron, Alexis M. Wood, Kas L. Gallucci. (lgd)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand for Damages and Injunctive relief pursuant to the TCPA against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1922497), filed by Kevin Yashtinsky.(Streett, James)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Kevin Yashtinsky. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yashtinsky v. WalMart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart, Inc.
Represented By: Karen P Freeman
Represented By: Meredith Connie Slawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Yashtinsky
Represented By: James Albert Streett
Represented By: Alexis Wood
Represented By: Kas Gallucci
Represented By: Joe P Leniski, Jr.
Represented By: Ron Marron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?