Wheat v. Holloway et al
Plaintiff: Tyrone Lucas Wheat
Defendant: Deputy J. Rhodes, Deputy K. Cogdill, Deputy B. Jornagan, Deputy S. Beard, Lieutenant R. McElroy, Deputy J. Taylor and Sheriff Shawn Holloway
Case Number: 5:2019cv05128
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Filing 15 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.SEALED DOCUMENT. Summons Issued as to J.Rhodes and R McElroy and USM285 Form(s) delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons issued with the following documents attached: #14 Sealed Document, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. An Order was entered on 9/4/2019 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. (lgd)
September 4, 2019 Filing 14 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.
August 30, 2019 Filing 13 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.ADDRESS INFORMATION PROVIDED for McElroy and Rhodes. (Davis, JaNan)
August 28, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Tyrone Lucas Wheat as to R. McElroy, J. Rhodes. (tg)
August 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tyrone Lucas Wheat. S. Beard served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019; K. Cogdill served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019; Shawn Holloway served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019; B. Jornagan served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019; J. Taylor served on 8/8/2019, answer due 8/29/2019. (tg)
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) with Jury Demand by S. Beard, K. Cogdill, Shawn Holloway, B. Jornagan, J. Taylor.(Davis, JaNan)
July 26, 2019 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to S. Beard, K. Cogdill, Shawn Holloway, B. Jornagan, R. McElroy, J. Rhodes, J. Taylor and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #8 Order Directing Service, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE S. Beard, K. Cogdill, Shawn Holloway, B. Jornagan, R. McElroy, J. Rhodes, J. Taylor and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on July 26, 2019. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(tg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Warden, Grimes Unit to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $3.17; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office; Fiscal Manager, AR Department of Community Correction). (tg)
July 26, 2019 Filing 6 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 and #2 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on July 26, 2019. (smg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Tyrone Lucas Wheat. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(lgd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form mailed to Plaintiff. (lgd)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: Complete IFP. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 7/31/2019. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on July 12, 2019. (lgd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Tyrone Lucas Wheat. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(lgd)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against S. Beard, K. Cogdill, Shawn Holloway, B. Jornagan, R. McElroy, J. Rhodes, J. Taylor, filed by Tyrone Lucas Wheat.(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheat v. Holloway et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy J. Rhodes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy K. Cogdill
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy B. Jornagan
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy S. Beard
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant R. McElroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy J. Taylor
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Shawn Holloway
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Lucas Wheat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?