Leato v. Teachers Credit Union and Tri-Force, Inc.
Plaintiff: Melissa Glaros, Laurina T. Leato and John Leato
Defendant: Teachers Credit Union and Tri-Force, Inc., Teachers Credit Union and Tri Force Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv05130
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Teachers Credit Union, Tri Force Inc. and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #9 Order Directing Service, #1 Complaint, #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (lgd)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Teachers Credit Union, Tri Force Inc. and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on September 11, 2019. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(lgd)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 OPINION AND ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE claims of John Leato and Melissa Glaros. The claims of Laurina Leato will proceed. (See Order for specifics) Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 10, 2019. (lgd)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 and #6 Motions for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis as after review it is found that Plaintiffs are unable to pay for the costs of commencement of this suit. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on July 30, 2019. (smg)
July 30, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann: #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by John Leato, Laurina T. Leato. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by John Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (tg) Modified motion on 7/31/2019 (src).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING that a Completed IFP be filed. Completed IFP due by 7/31/2019. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on July 17, 2019. (lgd)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished and pro se manual previously provided to plaintiffs. (tg)
July 15, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis MOTION for Service filed by John Leato, Melissa Glaros, Laurina T. Leato. Motions referred to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION for Service by Melissa Glaros, John Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (tg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Melissa Glaros, John Leato, Laurina T. Leato. (tg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Teachers Credit Union and Tri-Force, Inc., filed by John Leato, Melissa Glaros, Laurina T. Leato.(tg) modified to edit text (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leato v. Teachers Credit Union and Tri-Force, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teachers Credit Union and Tri-Force, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teachers Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tri Force Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Glaros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurina T. Leato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Leato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?